Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Claremont Property Co, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kiehn, Roland Walter, against Akshaya Hospitality Llc, represented by Dickey, Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint document appears to be incomplete or corrupted. The extracted text is not available due to an error in accessing the image.
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY LLC
Date: April 08, 2021EP - ANSWER - AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY LLC
Date: May 04, 2021EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 20, 2021EP - PLTFS RESPONSE TO MTN TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 24, 2021EP - NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA
Date: December 29, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 08, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021014150
Date: April 08, 2021EP - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY 04/14/21
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE HENRY, WILLIAM: ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION K ASSIGNED | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF ATTY FOR DFT - CONNOR HEALEY ESQ | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTFS RESPONSE TO MTN TO STRIKE DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ANSWER - AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY LLC | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: DICKEY, MICHAEL P ASSIGNED | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY 04/14/21 | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - AKSHAYA HOSPITALITY LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.