Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson, Robert, Ragsdale, Deana, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berglund, Jeffrey A, against Baird, Richard, Baird, Saconda, The Summerhouse Of Panama City Condo. Assoc., represented by Henry, David, Parker, Rhett Conlon, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2021013391
Date: April 05, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- SUMMERHOUSE OF PANAMA CITY
Date: April 05, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- RICHARD N BAIRD
Date: April 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO DFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITION | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 03/25/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN J/ , JDG: HENRY, WILLIAM | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFT THE SUMMERHOUSE OF PANAMA CITY CONDO ASSOC INC MOTION TO DETERMINE SEQUENCE OF DEPOSITIONS WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLFTS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLTS MENTAL ANGUISH CLAIM | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - PLFTS AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.