Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Steel Standing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dough, Grayden M, against Keeny Auto Repair Llc, Keeny, Donald R, represented by Barkley, Kellianne Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Commercial $0-50K |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Steel Standing, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, against Keeny Auto Repair LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, and Donald Keeny, an individual. The complaint seeks to enforce a construction lien and alleges a...
EP - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 13, 2022EP - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FOR DEFT
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/21/2024 AT 10:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANTING DFTS AMENDED MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.4666.1644. / 2023014937) | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/14/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER SETTING AND ESTABLISHING TIMELINES AND PROCEDURES FOR MOTIONS AND MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.