Case Last Refreshed: 29 minutes ago
Schneider, Jeffrey J, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Copus, Jennifer Hanson, against Target General Contracting Corp, represented by David, John T, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Jeffrey J. Schneider against Target General Contracting Corp. in the Circuit Court of the First Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract, violations of Florida Statute §501.2077, fra...
EP - PLTS MOTION TO WAIVE MEDIATION REQUIREMENT OF STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: January 26, 2023EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- PLAINTIFF | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT TARGET GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP - RECORDED (OR.4770.879. / 2024006059) | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/12/2024 AT 9:15 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: GOODMAN, JAMES J JR : DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FORM 1.977 | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT TARGET GENERAL CONTRACTING CORP - RECORDED (OR.4768.906. / 2024004593) | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 REFUND $21.00 RECEIPT #2024002700 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.