Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Magnolia Tree Apartments Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott M, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Mawhinney, Joseph Pace Ii, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Magnolia Tree Apartments, Inc. against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interes...
EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 25, 2021EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 25, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 25, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: March 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 25, 2021EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
Date: March 25, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 20, 2021EP - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 02, 2022EP - ORDER ON PLTS MOTION FOR JUDICAL NOTICE
Date: August 05, 2021EP - MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 22, 2021EP - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 22, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 30, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 30, 2021EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 08/05/21 AT 2:30 PM CST
Date: August 05, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 30, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 06, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: September 07, 2021EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 25, 2021EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 28, 2021EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 22, 2021EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 16, 2021EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: December 02, 2021EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 25, 2021EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 24, 2021EP - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 18, 2021EP - DEFT AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 11, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 22, 2021EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 06, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 22, 2021EP - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 06, 2021EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 08/05/21 @ 2:30 PM CST
Date: April 27, 2021EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 21, 2021EP - DFTS MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 16, 2021EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 24, 2021EP - DEFTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 07, 2021EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 05, 2021EP - ORDER ON PLTS MOTION TO STRIKE DFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 05, 2021EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
Date: August 19, 2021EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 17, 2021EP - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
Date: June 17, 2021EP - COVER LETTER
Date: August 05, 2021EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 13, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVING OBJECTION TO DFTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 12, 2021EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DT OF DFTS CORP REP
Date: June 03, 2021EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 28, 2021EP - MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 22, 2021EP - PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: May 28, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 04/04/2022 AT 3:45 PM IN JC/ , JDG: GOODMAN, JAMES J JR | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/06/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II : CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.