Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Magnolia Tree Apartments Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott M, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Mawhinney, Joseph Pace Ii, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Magnolia Tree Apartments, Inc. against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges breach of contract by the defendant. The plainti...
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021011990
Date: March 26, 2021EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 25, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY SCOTT M ROSSO FOR PLT
Date: March 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON PLTFS OBJECTIONS TO NOTICES OF NON PARTY PRODUCTION 1. OVERRULED , 2. SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART 3. SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART 4. SUSTAINED IN PART AND OVERRULED IN PART | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING OBJECTION TO DEFEDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 02/28/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN J/ , JDG: HENRY, WILLIAM | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 11/22/2021 AT 2:15 PM IN JC/ , JDG: HENRY, WILLIAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.