Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Helmer, Christine, Helmer, Jeremy, Morgan, Thomas J Jr, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Morgan, Thomas J Jr, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Molhem, David W, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Christine Helmer and Jeremy Helmer against State Farm Florida Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The case number is 21000389CA. The plaintiffs are seeking an am...
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 24, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 24, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021011649
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ISLAND RESERVE CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT AND MOTION TO COMPEL | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME- PLTF | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER GRANDTING PLFTS SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO EXPERT DISCOVERY | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.