Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schuster, Joseph, Schuster, Tracy Meadows, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Price, William B, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Fakhoury, James, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Tracy Meadows Schuster and Joseph Schuster against FedNat Insurance Company in the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court in Bay County, Florida. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract and demand a jury trial. Tracy Meadows Sc...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2021EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 23, 2021EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFT | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFT | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - FEDNAT INS CO | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021011395 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION K ASSIGNED | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: PRICE, WILLIAM B ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.