Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sheets, Karen K, Sheets, Robert C, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Hatfield, Roger A, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Grimley, J Michael Jr, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Robert C. Sheets and Karen K. Sheets against FedNat Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit, Bay County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages exceeding $15,000.00, exclusive of attorney's fees, c...
EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 28, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 28, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT (PARTIES REACHED AN AGREEMENT | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 06/21/21 @ 8:00AM CST | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 04/06/21 @ 1:30PM | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: GRIMLEY, J MICHAEL JR ASSIGNED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.