Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chapmans Tradeshow Services Llc, Marketing Dimensions International Inc, Rodger Wayne Naugle Roofing Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kiehn, Roland Walter, against Mdg Contracting Llc, Muller, Jason G Iii, Smith, Eli Che, represented by French, Stephen, Handin, Jason E, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Rodger Wayne Naugle Roofing, LLC (RWN), Chapmans Tradeshow Services, LLC (Chapmans), and Marketing Dimensions International, Inc. (MDI) against MDG Contracting, LLC (MDG), Eli Che Smith (Smith), and Jason G. Mueller (Muelle...
PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019047442
Date: August 28, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 27, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLFTS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITON | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS OF ATTY FOR ELI CHEE SMITH - STEPHEN B FRENCH | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED ELI CHE SMITH | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED JASON G MULLER | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - STANDING CIVIL ORDER MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON WARD DAMON PLTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE DFTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.