Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Breault, Candice, Breault, Reginald, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Kandell, Scott E, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Reginald Breault and Candice Breault against defendant Florida Peninsula Insurance Company. The amount in controversy in this matter exceeds $15,000. The plaintiffs are residents of Florida, while the defendant i...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 23, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE
Date: August 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 08/28/2019 FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: KANDELL, SCOTT E ASSIGNED | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGE FISHEL, JOHN L II: ASSIGNED | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/23/2019 CASE NUMBER 19003211CA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.