Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
O Boyle, Daniel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Price, William B, against Edison Insurance Company, represented by Luna, Patrick Wade, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Daniel O'Boyle against Edison Insurance Company for breach of contract. Daniel O'Boyle is a resident of Florida and owns a property located at 2617 Ferol Lane, Lynn Haven in Bay County, Florida. Edison Insurance Company is ...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 21, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: August 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/07/2020 AT 11:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING- 12/7/20 AT 11:30 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF DANIEL OBOYLE | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION 09/16/2020 @ 10:00 A.M. OF DANIEL O'BOYLE | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.