Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ennis, Charles, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Bearman, Samuel, Warren, J Phillip, against Amwins Access Insurance Services Llc, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S London, represented by Williams, A Grady Iv, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Charles Ennis against AmWINS Access Insurance Services, LLC, as brokers for Underwriters at Lloyds of London. The plaintiff alleges breach of an insurance policy issued by the defendant, seeking damages in excess of $15,000...
EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 14, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019046110
Date: August 20, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DIVISION N ASSIGNED | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE SMILEY, ELIJAH: ASSIGNED | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WARREN, J PHILLIP ASSIGNED | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE A GRADY WILLIAMS AND MATTHEW HAMBRICK FOR DEFENDANT | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY ATTY. J PHILLIP WARREN AS CO-COUNSEL FOR CHARLES ENNIS | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019046110 | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.