Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mashburn, Jerry, Mashburn, Joette, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Price, William B, against Progressive Property Insurance Corp, represented by Bishop, Kevin L, Campos, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Jerry Mashburn and Joette Mashburn against Progressive Property Insurance Corp in the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit Court in Bay County, Florida. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract by Progressive Property Insurance Corp...
EP - MEDIATION REPORT CASE SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: October 12, 2020EP - AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ENTRY UPON PLAINTIFF'S LAND
Date: June 05, 2020EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE
Date: August 19, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 19, 2019EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 10, 2019EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/22/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C : DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - MEDIATION REPORT CASE SETTLED AT MEDIATION | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/22/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN TBA/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 10/02/20 @ 8:00AM | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF ENTRY ON LAND 08/12/2020 @ 11:00 A.M. | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY 03/22/2021 @ 9;00 A.M.; AND PRETRIAL 03/01/2021 @ 9;30 A.M. | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, FIRST INTERROG AND FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ENTRY UPON PLAINTIFF'S LAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.