Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Restore All Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter J, against First Protective Insurance Company, represented by Batemberg, Cecile, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint was filed by Restore All, LLC on behalf of Wendy Culpepper against First Protective Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract and seeks damages exceeding $15,000. The plaintiff claims that Culpepper had a policy of in...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR DEFENDANT BY ATTY. JENNIFER ORTEGA AND CECILE BATEMBURG | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: ORTEGA, JENNIFER ASSIGNED | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: BATEMBERG, CECILE ASSIGNED | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS - ATTY MICHAEL FISCHETTI | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS - ATTY MICHAEL FISCHETTI | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.