Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Boardwalk Beach Resort Community Association Inc, filed a(n) Other case represented by Milam, David Harper, against Royal American Real Estate Inc, represented by Sanborn, Clifford W Iii, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2019 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by the Boardwalk Beach Resort Community Association, Inc. against Royal American Real Estate, Inc. The Boardwalk Beach Resort is a condominium located in Bay County, Florida, and is subject to restrictive covenants known as th...
EP - NOTICE OF FILING MASTER TRIAL INDEX
Date: December 10, 2021EP - NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM CIRCUIT TO DCA - Recorded (OR.4475.550. / 2021080061)
Date: October 19, 2021EP -DOCKETING STATEMENT & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
Date: November 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER - 1D21-3176 APPEAL CASE DISMISSED | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $226.50 RECEIPT #2022004340 | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEALS PREPARATION - CIRCUIT CIVIL ASSESSED $226.50 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | INDEX 1D21-3176 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER - COVER | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EFILED INDEX 1D21-3176 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER -BILLING | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING MASTER TRIAL INDEX | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON 8/13/21 | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EP -DOCKETING STATEMENT & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.