Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anthousis, Julie, against Capital One Bank Usa Na, Clerk Of The Court Bay County Florida, Johnson, Casey Lynn, Mcinturff, Robert Logan, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Regions Bank DBA Regions Mortgage against Robert Logan Mclnturff, Casey Lynn Johnson, Kaitlin Renee Taylor, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Clerk of the Court, Bay County, Florida, State of Florida Depart...
EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- CAPITAL ONE BANK
Date: August 12, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED- ROBERT LOGAN MCINTURFF
Date: August 12, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4178.412. / 2019089215) | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 08/24/19 KAITLYN RENEE TAYLOR | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUMMONS- 8/29/19- CASEY JOHNSON | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUMMONS - 8/29/19 - ROBERT MCINTURFF | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED - UNIVERSAL CONTRACTING OF FLORIDA - 08/28/19 | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED - CLERK OF COURT - 08/28/19 | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - 08/29/2019 ROBERT LOGAN MCINTURFF | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - 08/29/2019 CASEY LYNN JOHNSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.