Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Flowers, James Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Manuel, Jay Wesley, against Nolan, Mason James, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by James Robert Flowers against Mason James Nolan in the Circuit Court, Fourteenth Judicial Circuit of the State of Florida, in and for Bay County. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $15,000. James Robert Flowers, the ...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 07, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019043787
Date: August 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | EP- STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER - MASON JAMES NOLAN | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS- MASON NOLAN | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFAULT ENTERED ON MASON NOLAN | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR DEFAULT ON MASON NOLAN | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | RESULT FOR : DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 05/12/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN J/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH : CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - REQUEST FOR CASE MGMT CONFERENCE | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - MASON JAMES NOLAN | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.