Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Black, Jimmy F Jr, Black, Loretta L, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Moskowitz, Laurence, against United Services Automobile Association, Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Oughton, Kathryn M, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiffs, Jimmy F. Black Jr. and Loretta L. Black, against the Defendant, United Services Automobile Association. The Plaintiffs are residents of Bay County, Florida, while the Defendant is a corporation licensed to t...
EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 12, 2021EP - SUBPOENA SERVED ON MICHAEL KERR
Date: November 17, 2020EP - PLTFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 09/02/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN JC/ , JDG: SMILEY, ELIJAH | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLFTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - DEFTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.