Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dama, James Franklin, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Morgan, Thomas J Jr, against Us Coastal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Valentine, Rose Y, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with HENRY, WILLIAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENRY, WILLIAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by James Franklin Dama against US Coastal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiff is seeking an amount in excess of $15,000, exclusive of attorney fees, costs, and interest. The plaintiff is a resident of Bay Coun...
EP - PLTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DFT
Date: April 09, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 09, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TP SETTLE AT MEDIATION | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - PLTS DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDERED MEDIATION | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE 09/30/21 @ 1:30 PM | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.