Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mediverse Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Roberts, John William, against Agapiade, Athanasios, Cryer, Jeffrey, Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Kingii Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Kelly, Michael Brian, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with SMILEY, ELIJAH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMILEY, ELIJAH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019023441
Date: April 30, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - KINGII INC
Date: April 05, 2019EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE SMILEY, ELIJAH: ASSIGNED | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | DIVISION N ASSIGNED | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - COVER LETTER | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT BY WAY OF TRANSFER OF VENUE | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY WAY OF TRANSFER OF VENUE | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 01/10/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 01/10/2020 @ 10;00 A.M. | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S, DONNIE READ, JEFFREY CRYER, AND ANTHANASIOS AGAPIADE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER WITH INC. MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.