Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elevate Exteriors Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Levy, Harold Esq, against Fednat Insurance Company, represented by Zimmern, Benjamin Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Elevate Exteriors, Inc. on behalf of Yolanda Jones and Eric Jones against FedNat Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages under an insurance policy resulting from a loss of property due to Hurricane Michael. The amo...
EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: March 13, 2020EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 02, 2019EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKET | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE INTERROGATORIES | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF SUCRE LARRAGOITY ON BEHALF OF FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY 05/19/2020 @ 11;00 A.M. EST | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - FEDNAT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.