Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Razor Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Moore, Ashley Lenee, against Burns, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES J JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES J JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Razor Capital, LLC against Jerry Burns in the Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit in Bay County, Florida. The complaint alleges that Jerry Burns, who resides in Bay County, entered into a loan and/or credit line agre...
EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2019EP - SUMMONS JERRY BURNS
Date: March 30, 2019EP - NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: March 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DIVISION E ASSIGNED | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE GOODMAN, JAMES J JR: ASSIGNED | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/08/2021 AT 2:15 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - MTN CONT WRIT OF GARN REOPEN - AVIATOR COLLEGE LLC | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR PTF | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021046330 | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.4194.126. / 2019100943) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.