Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Holsombake, James, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Barnhill, David D, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Koener, Katherine Louise, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by James Holsombake against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company for breach of contract. James Holsombake is a resident of Florida and owns property in Bay County, Florida. Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Co...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 22, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY
Date: March 22, 2019EP - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 22, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 22, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 22, 2019EP - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE TO SET CAUSE FOR TRIAL AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.