Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Peterson, Herman, Peterson, Marie, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Kunz, Paul, against Peoples Trust Insurance Company, represented by Richardson, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Herman Peterson and Marie Peterson against People's Trust Insurance Company. The plaintiffs claim that the defendant denied insurance benefits for damage caused by Hurricane Michael. Although the defendant admitted there wa...
EP - CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 06, 2019EP - INITIAL COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2019EP - SUMMONS ISSUED PEOPLES TRUST INSURANCE
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE THAT CASE IS AT ISSUE AN READY FOR TRIAL | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR BAD-FAITH | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING 08/02/2019 @ 2;45 P.M. | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 08/02/2019 AT 2:45 PM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
July 14, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING- 8/2/19 -AT 2:45 | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING- 8/2/19 AT 2:45 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.