Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Hammocks Residential Community Association Inc, Unknown Tenant 2, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Spouse Of Alma M Jones, Jones, Alma M, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FISHEL, JOHN L II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFISHEL, JOHN L II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2016 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | EP - RESPONSE TO COURTS NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 04/16/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FISHEL, JOHN L II | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT: THE ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE'S REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMSSING CASE (DOC. 84) | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - DEFAULT/NOT ENTERED - ALMA M JONES ATTY. OF RECORD ANSWERED FOR HER 02/11/2016 | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALMA M JONES; UNKNOWN TENANT 1; AND UNKNOWN TENANT 2 | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT: ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEES REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE (DOC. 84) | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | EP - STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | EP - ORDER SUB OF COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.