Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bay Medical Center, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Pate, Tammy, Pate, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2012 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO JUDGE OVERSTREET | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | REPLACEMENT STIPULATION- TAMMY PATE | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER THAT STIP OF THE PARTIES IS ACCEPTED & APPROVED BY THE COURT | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3405.1708 / 2012023164) | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNTS DUE | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER THAT STIP IS ACCEPTED & ACTION IS HEREBY CLOSED | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 05/01/2012 AT 10:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PTFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JDMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.