Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Savell, Warren M, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Boley, Donna J, Boley, Stephen M, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with ELLINOR, THOMAS ROLAND presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeELLINOR, THOMAS ROLAND Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2012036646 | |
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $100 PTF | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO NEWS HERALD RE: PUBLICATION | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALES SET FOR 05/29/2012 AT 11:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , JDG: FORECLOSURE CLERK | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 05/29/12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.