Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Green Tree Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Edgewater Beach Resort Community Association Inc, Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant # 1, Unknown Spouse Of Donna Draper, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $250K+ |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RET SERVED DOUGLAS C ZAHM, PA | |
March 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT - DOUGLAS C ZAHM, P.A. | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | **ORIGINALS RETURNED TO DOUGLAS ZAHM - CASE DISMISSED** | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED DONNA DRAPER | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | EP - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | EP - NOT/VOLUNTARY DISMISS /CASE - RECORDED (OR.3535.1775 / 2013046253) | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 08/01/2013 AT 10:35 AM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MGN CONFERENCE 08/01/13 @ 10:35 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.