Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hutton, James W, against Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Palmetto Trace Subdivision Homeowners Association Inc, Merrick Bank Corporation, Palmetto Trace Community Association Inc, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $250K+ |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MTN TO POSTPONE TRANSFER OF TITLE | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/09/2013 AT 11:20 AM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/09/2013 @ 11;15 A.M. | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | EP - OBJECTION TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO POSTPONE TRANSFER OF TITLE AND MOTION TO COMPEL ISSUANCE OF CERT. OF SALE | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 08/12/2013 AT 2:55 PM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER THAT MOTION TO CANCEL & RESCHEDULE SALE IS DENIED AS MOOT | |
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.