Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pnc Mortgage, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant # 1, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation, Unknown Spouse Of Jason K Hill, Hill, Jason K, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with MCCLELLAN, HENTZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCLELLAN, HENTZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $0-50K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOT/VOLUNTARY DISMISS /CASE - Recorded (OR.3492.1170 / 2013014688) | |
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 03/04/2013 AT 10:00 AM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
July 10, 2012 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEF/DEF ENTERED ON JASON K HILL, TAYLOR BEAN AND WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP ANS UNK TENANT NKA JOEY HILL | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.