Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Newman, Jared K, against Us Bank National Association, Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant # 1, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Clerk Of The Court Of Bay County, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $100.00 PLT | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2013075927 | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO NEWS HERALD RE: PUBLICATION | |
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.