Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sterling Reef Owners Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Udoni, Michael O, represented by Uhlfelder, Daniel W, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $0-50K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3482.1531 / 2013007700) | |
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 19, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- MITCH DEVER ESQ FOR DFT | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DFTS REQ FOR TAKING JUDICIAL NOTICE & MOTION TO DISMISS / MICHAEL UDONI | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | DFTS REQ FOR TAKING JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MICHAEL O UNONI 02/08/12 | |
February 20, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE | |
February 20, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER TO CLERK | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: UHLFELDER, DANIEL W ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.