Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rajulaid, Alma Jean, filed a(n) Other case against Pippin, Betty Diane, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2010 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR THE DEFENDANT - Recorded (OR.3332.17 / 2011030720) | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE ADMITTED | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT LIST OF PLAINTIFF ALMA JEAN RAJULAID | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST OF PLT ALMA JEAN RAJULAID | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 06/09/2011 AT 3:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: FENSOM, JAMES B | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST OF PLT ALMA JEAN RAJULAID | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | PLTS CASE SUMMARY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST OF PLT ALMA JEAN RAJULAID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.