Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patterson, Jessie Lee, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Patterson, Henry Edward, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property - Other - $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL ONLY | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL (AS TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL ONLY) TO RESPOND IN WRITING FIVE (5) DAYS PRIOR TO 10/05/16 | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 10/05/2016 AT 1:30 PM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | EP - MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL & MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PTF - REOPEN | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2015012197 | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | REOPEN/OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $50.00 | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL TO ANSWER 5 DAYS PRIOR TO 06/24/14 - Recorded (OR.3619.863 / 2014034268) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.