Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tyndall Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Sirmans, Melanie Jayne, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, Whitt, Sherman, Allstate Property And Casual Insurance Company, Sirmans, Robert Edwards Jr, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED @ MELANIE JAYNE SIRMANS | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED SHERMAN WHITT | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - ROBERT EDWARDS SIRMANS JR. | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL -(AS TO MTN FOR DEFICIENCY JUDG ONLY) TO FILE CASE ACTIVITY BEFORE 02/13/14 | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: HENRY, MICHAEL J ASSIGNED | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 02/13/2014 AT 8:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: FENSOM, JAMES B | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGE FENSOM, JAMES B: ASSIGNED- AFTER CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2012078138 | |
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.