Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Estate Of Kevin Glenn Gorham, Gorham, Joni, filed a(n) Other case against Pyle, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with MCCLELLAN, HENTZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCLELLAN, HENTZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 06/26/2012 AT 9:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: MCCLELLAN, HENTZ | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL TO ANSWER 5 DAYS BEFORE 06/26/12 | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ACCOUNTING EXECUTED BY MARK PYLE, VICE PRESIDENT DATED MARCH 22, 2011 IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED MARCH 23, 2011 | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DFTS MTN FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ACCOUNTING-DFTS PRECISION | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PTFS MTN TO EXTEND PRELIMINARY INJUCTION & PTFS MTN TO REINSTATE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 02/01/11 @9:15 | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.