Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lafarge, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Dever, Mitch, Dever Development Company, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2017048420 FROM CASH BOND #000079 | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DISBURSING COURT REG FUNDS | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ATTORNEY REGARDING BOND POSTED | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED MITCH DEVER | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE & JUDGMENT / DISMISSAL TO RESPOND IN WRITING 5 DAYS BEFORE 10/15/13 | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION HEARING CIVIL SET FOR 10/15/2013 AT 11:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF REP FOR DEVER DEVELOPMENT CO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.