Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant # 2, Unknown Tenant # 1, Unknown Spouse Of Michelle K Majure, Majure, Michelle K, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with MCCLELLAN, HENTZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCLELLAN, HENTZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2014031484 | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $100.00 PLT | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO BAY COUNTY BULLET | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.