Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Beneficial Florida Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Scott, Jennifer Mouser, against Beneficial Florida Inc, George, Carolyn R, Unknown Occupants, Unknown Spouse Of Carolyn George, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3397.2338 / 2012017179)
Date: April 02, 2012COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: December 10, 2010EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 18, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2012EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS /DFT CAROLYN GEORGE
Date: June 26, 2012RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROG BY ATTY. ENRICO G GONZALEZ
Date: July 23, 2012VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: December 10, 2010RESPONSE FROM CAROLYN GEORGE, PRO SE
Date: December 29, 2010EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 18, 2019EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF 1ST INTERROGS TO PTF / DFT CAROLYN GEORGE
Date: June 26, 2012EP - MOTION TO REFER CASE TO MEDIATION /CAROLYN GEORGE
Date: June 26, 2012EMERGENCY PETITION TO STAY SALE AND TO SET ASIDE FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2012ORDER STRIKING CANCELED NOTATION ON PROMISSORY NOTE AND DEEMING NOTE REINSTATED
Date: January 02, 2019AFF OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: January 24, 2012EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR MTGLQ INVESTORS LP BY ATTY. JENNIFER M SCOTT
Date: December 14, 2018MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HEARING MEMORANDUM STATUS
Date: March 29, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 02/05/2019 @ 12;30 P.M. EST | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF HEARING 02/05/2019 @ 12:30 P.M. EST | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER STRIKING CANCELED NOTATION ON PROMISSORY NOTE AND DEEMING NOTE REINSTATED | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR MTGLQ INVESTORS LP BY ATTY. JENNIFER M SCOTT | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING FINAL JMT, WITHDRAWING ORIG NOTE & MTG, DISMISSING ACTION & CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.3584.2225 / 2014007735) | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.