Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Centennial Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Arnold, Angela L, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOVERSTREET, MICHAEL C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Commercial $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3369.1889 / 2011061294) | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 12/01/2011 AT 2:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: OVERSTREET, MICHAEL C | |
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 12/01/11 @ 2:00 PM | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR 2 | |
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BK | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00 | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | REAL AUCTION JUDICIAL SALE/ELECTRONIC ASSESSED $70.00 | |
September 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2011058432 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.