Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hancock Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hughes, James Robert, against Baber, Jessica L, Arthur Rutenberg Homes Inc, Cedar Creek At Deer Point Lake, Deer Point Properties Llc, Royal Oak Enterprises Llc, (total of 10) See All represented by Sewell, Kimberly Watson, in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $250K+ |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION & ORDER DISBURSING UNCLAIMED FUNDS | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER TO ATTY REGARDING GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF WRITS OF GARNISHMENT (PANHANDLE) | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (SUNTRUST) | |
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REGIONS) | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING JOINT MTN FOR CONTINUANCE | |
June 11, 2014 | Docket Event | EP-NOTICE CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR 06/12/14 | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | EP - JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE - HANCOCK BANK | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | EP-AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 06/12/14 @ 8:00 AM | |
May 30, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 06/12/2014 AT 8:30 AM IN JC/ , JDG: FENSOM, JAMES B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.