Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gmac Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenants Owners, First Capital Bank Of Kentucky, Fifth Third Bank, Unknown Spouse Of Charles E Booth, Unknown Spouse Of Keith A Brooks, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Non-Homestead, Residential $250K+ |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3383.1088 / 2012005726) | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGE ELLINOR, THOMAS R: ASSIGNED | |
August 19, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: CHEATHAM, KIMBERLY J ASSIGNED | |
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- KIMBERLY CHEATHAM ESQ FOR KEITH BROOKS | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FIRST CAPITAL OF KENTUCKY- 12/14/10 | |
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ORIGINAL FOR FIRST CAPITAL BANK | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - 12/14/2010 CHARLES E BOOTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.