Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenants In Possession #2, Unknown Tenants In Possession #1, Gulf Highlands Beach Resort Homeowners Association Inc, Paravalos, Delmira V, Paravalos, James, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bay County, FL, . Bay County, FL Superior Courts with FENSOM, JAMES B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFENSOM, JAMES B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2010 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mort Foreclosure-Homestead, Residential $50-249K |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | NOT/VOLUNTARY DISMISS /CASE - Recorded (OR.3364.389 / 2011056838) | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING - CIVIL SET FOR 09/19/2011 AT 9:45 AM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL & RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE HEARING | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 08/01/2011 AT 1:00 PM IN JC/ , JDG: ELLINOR, THOMAS R | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE HEARING | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE HEARING | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.