Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Perez, Latoya Holton, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez, Charles Jr, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, SEAN DAVID Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL/CHARLES PEREZ JR | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WIHT PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) - REC #202300004287 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Court - Family scheduled on 6/22/2023 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge SEAN BREWER presiding. | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:Family Court set for 6/22/2023 at 0130 PM in MX with Judge SEAN BREWER | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING AND DENYING MOTION FOR APPEAR BY ZOOM SET FOR 6/22/2023 AT 1:30 PM | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND WAIVER/RESPONDENT | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/HUSBAND | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER/HUSBAND | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN/HUSBAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.