Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson, Shane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Harris, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, SEAN DAVID Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGEMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - REC #202300001897 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Court - Family scheduled on 3/23/2023 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:Family Court set for 3/23/2023 at 0900 AM in MX with Judge JODI CASON | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRING CASE TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE, AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL HEARING SET FOR 3/23/2023 AT 9:00 AM | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: BREWER , SEAN assigned | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 022023DR000048DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/16/2023 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2023000803 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.