Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Raute, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wilkins, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with BREWER, SEAN DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, SEAN DAVID Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | List of Exhibits A1,B2,C3, D4,E5, F6 | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | List of Exhibits/1A | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED/VICTORIA WILKINS | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - INJUNCTION scheduled on 2/23/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge SEAN BREWER presiding. | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORTS FROM SHERRIFF'S OFFICE/TEXT MESSAGES | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.