Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cason, Jodi filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case against Baker Distributing Company Llc, Higginbotham, John D Iii, Higginbotham, Kristina A, Mercantile Bank, Td Bank National Association, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ISSUED KRISTINA A HIGGINBOTHAM A/K/A KRISTINA HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: January 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT # 1
Date: January 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED BAKER DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY - REG AGENT
Date: January 17, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O UNITED SATTES CORPORATION COMPANY
Date: January 17, 2023STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF FILING- PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: January 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED UNK TENANT #1
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- #202300000378
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: February 10, 2023STATEMENT OF CLAIM COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: January 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED KRISTINA A HIGGINBOTHAM AKA KRISTINA HIGGINBOTHAM- 02/01/2023
Date: February 13, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED- KRISTINA A HIGGINBOTHAM A/K/A KRISTINA HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: January 19, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: March 11, 2023ANSWER CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MORGAN HIGGINBOTHAM AS UNKOWN TENANT 1 ON 2/1/23
Date: February 07, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOHN D HIGGINBOTHAM III (DECEASED)
Date: February 07, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED KRISTINA A HIGGINBOTHAM 2/1/23
Date: February 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: March 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED BAKER DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC- 01/27/2023
Date: February 10, 2023MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2023VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE
Date: April 07, 2023Notice of Hearing CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 27, 2023HEARING FORM
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE
Date: August 17, 2023NOTICE OF FILING- VERIFIED INCORRECT SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 22, 2023AD LITEM REPORT TO COURT
Date: August 22, 2023HEARING FORM
Date: August 23, 2023MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WEDNESDAY DECEMBER 20 2023 AT 9:00 AM
Date: August 25, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED VIRGINIA HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: August 25, 2023PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED
Date: October 16, 2023ORDER NOTICE SETTING HEARING NOVEMBER 22 2023
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- NOTICE OF ACTION (ELECTRONIC COPY)
Date: November 08, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED JADA HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: November 30, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED CHELSEA HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: December 05, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID SKYLER HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: December 12, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED KYLIE HIGGINBOTHAM
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 2/21/2024 0900 AM Judge JODI CASON results CANCELLED on 12/12/2023 | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 2/23/2024 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number MX 2023006283 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $12.50 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $12.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $12.50 Receipt Number MX 2023006286 | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIRGINIA HIGGINBOTHAM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.