Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bones, Reginald, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bones, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with GLORIA WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGLORIA WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:Family Court set for 2/18/2021 at 0130 PM in MX with Judge GLORIA WALKER | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CASE | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE - THURSDAY, 02/18/2021 1:30PM | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Court - Family scheduled on 2/18/2021 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding. | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: WALKER , GLORIA R assigned | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 022021DR000004DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/6/2021 | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.