Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sumitomo Mitsui Finance And Le, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Batta, Ravi, against Griffis, Mary J, Griffis Family Logging Inc, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE- #202000003773 | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MARY J GRIFFIS /REG AGENT FOR GRIFFIS FAMILY LOGGING INC | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MARY J GRIFFIS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF REX ALLAN GRIFFIS 1/21/20 | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: WALKER , GLORIA R Assigned | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00 | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006683 | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 022019CA000157CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/20/2019 | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.